A4U

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities to improve the quality of life for people with disabilities and/or long term conditions by provision of advice, information and advocacy services for disabled people, their families and carers in Shropshire and its borders, enabling people with disabilities to improve choice and control over their lives, assist independent living and maximise financial wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £159,030 from 5 government contract(s) and £26,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 17 May 2002: Standard registration
- DIAL SHROPSHIRE TELFORD & WREKIN LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Hiam | Chair | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Louise Sneddon | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Richards | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Scott Forsyth | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Susan Shaw | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Claire Crackett MBE DL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.74k | £195.77k | £184.53k | £277.90k | £219.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.40k | £181.89k | £178.17k | £220.72k | £225.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £71.51k | £155.37k | £147.73k | £123.64k | £159.03k | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.65k | N/A | £4.73k | £60.00k | £26.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 FEBRUARY 2002. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 AUGUST 2007. as amended on 11 Mar 2021 as amended on 25 Oct 2023 as amended on 25 Oct 2023 as amended on 25 Oct 2023 as amended on 25 Oct 2023 as amended on 25 Oct 2023 as amended on 25 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF AN INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICE AND TO ASSIST THOSE PEOPLE EITHER DIRECTLY OR THROUGH THEIR CARERS, RELATIVES, FRIENDS AND ADVOCATES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
A 4 U
Louise House
Roman Road
SHREWSBURY
SY3 9JN
- Phone:
- 01743539201
- Email:
- advice@a4u.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window