LINCOLN COLLEGE VACATION PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Each year Lincoln College Vacation Project runs two/three week long holidays for children living in the Oxford area who are involved with social services in order to give them a break from whatever difficulties they may be experiencing and an opportunity to try new things.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 13 June 2002: Standard registration
- 22 February 2024: Funds received from 265840 OLIVER '68
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jody La Porte | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr NIGEL EMPTAGE | Trustee | 04 February 2017 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR STEFAN ENCHELMAIER | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.65k | £8.49k | £18.08k | £42.65k | £33.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £801 | £9.07k | £32.33k | £32.56k | £34.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 December 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 November 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED 13 MAY 2002 AND 27 APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE HOLIDAYS FOR DEPRIVED CHILDREN FROM THE OXFORD AREA..
Area of benefit
CHILDREN IN THE OXFORD AREA WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Turl Street
Oxford
Oxfordshire
OX1 3DR
- Phone:
- 07581243961
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window