HULA ANIMAL RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The rescue and sanctuary care of animals, including veterinary services until they are re-homed. To promote public education in matters concerning animal welfare, and to provide advice and support where required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 09 October 2002: Standard registration
- 18 November 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1090499 NATIONAL ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 22ND NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 JULY 2002. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND TO HELP TO PREVENT SUFFERING AND DISTRESS IN ANIMALS AND OTHER SENTIENT CREATURES IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVISION OF RESCUE AND REHOMING FACILITIES OFFERING SANCTUARY, CARE AND VETERINARY SERVICES IN TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT ACCOMMODATION FOR SUCH ANIMALS. (II) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN MATTERS CONCERNING ANIMAL WELFARE AND AID AND INFORM PERSONS AND FAMILIES ON THE PROPER CARE AND MANAGEMENT OF THEIR ANIMALS, (III) TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND HARDSHIP OF PEOPLE AND FAMILIES IN SITUATIONS OF DISADVANTAGE, DISABLEMENT, OR POVERTY WHERE THEY NEED HELP AND ADVICE OVER PROBLEMS WITH THEIR PETS OR OTHER ANIMALS AND SENTIENT CREATURES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window