Bristol City Robins Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities are assisting in the education of children within the Bristol area through the use of the game of football and other sports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income:
£2,476,018
Donations and legacies | £402.45k | |
Charitable activities | £2.04m | |
Other trading activities | £26.80k | |
Investments | £2.36k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,107,398
Raising funds | £62.81k | |
Charitable activities | £2.04m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £176,976 from 3 government contract(s) and £196,676 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £62.81k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.04m | |
Retained for future use | £368.62k |
People

44 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 22 July 2002: Standard registration
- Bristol City Community Trust (Working name)
- BRISTOL CITY COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- BRISTOL CITY F C FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY SCHEME (Previous name)
- Bristol City Robins Foundation (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Andrew Baker | Chair | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin John Blake | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Thomas | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark Cooke | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cherry Kraus | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jon Lansdown | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18m | £1.27m | £1.70m | £2.07m | £2.48m | |
|
Total expenditure | £967.15k | £1.03m | £1.57m | £1.93m | £2.11m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £10.65k | N/A | £176.98k | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.71k | £76.53k | £178.44k | £311.70k | £196.68k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £197.93k | £166.83k | £97.16k | £139.29k | £402.45k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £44.41k | £62.45k | £69.07k | £74.54k | £26.80k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £937.14k | £1.04m | £1.53m | £1.86m | £2.04m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £199 | £51 | £79 | £241 | £2.36k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £925.09k | £988.65k | £1.50m | £1.86m | £2.04m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £42.07k | £42.96k | £65.90k | £65.04k | £62.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £4.86k | £5.10k | £6.36k | £6.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £36.75k | £32.98k | £52.70k | £39.33k | £29.66k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £495.40k | £727.82k | £909.24k | £1.07m | £1.65m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £111.20k | £101.03k | £172.12k | £172.28k | £374.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/01/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/04/2011 as amended on 12 Jan 2019 as amended on 04 Feb 2020 as amended on 12 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, IN EACH CASE ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND INCLUDE: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREATER BRISTOL AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL; THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN GREATER BRISTOL AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE DELIVERY OF SPORTS CENTRED EDUCATION, TRAINING AND WORK EXPERIENCE; ANDTHE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS OBJECTS CLAUSE, "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL OR DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING BACK INTO SOCIETY).
Area of benefit
CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOLS WITHIN THE COUNTY OF AVON AND NEIGHBOURING AREA AND TO PROVIDE IN BRISTOL AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA FACILITIES AT (INTER ALIA) THE ASTON GATE STADIUM
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASHTON GATE STADIUM
ASHTON ROAD
BRISTOL
BS3 2EJ
- Phone:
- 01179630636
- Email:
- dan.white@bcfc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window