PETERBOROUGH HIV SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for people affected and effected by HIV/AIDS. Educations and training in the affects, effects and prevention of HIV/AIDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 22 October 2002: Standard registration
- 25 February 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 25 February 2011: Funds transferred to 288527 THE TERRENCE HIGGINS TRUST
- PHSS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.18k | £249.13k | £238.02k | £211.77k | £226.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.44k | £289.79k | £256.82k | £228.25k | £202.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 30 March 2009 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 01 April 2009 | 60 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 03 March 2008 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 31 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 28 August 2007 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 August 2007 | 212 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH JUNE 1995, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19TH JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE EFFECTS OF HUMAN IMMUNE-DEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) INFECTION AND ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROME (AIDS). (2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING OR AT RISK FROM HIV INFECTION AND AIDS BY GIVING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE TO SUFFERERS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OR ANY PERSON CONCERNED ABOUT HIV OR AIDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window