Trustees NOTTS COUNTY F.C. COMMUNITY PROGRAMME
Charity Number: 1091927

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dianne Jackson | Chair | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tommy Fairweather | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nick Proverbs | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joe Palmer | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Pollard | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Sharp | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Roberts | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.