Financial history KOMSO CHILDRENS HOSPITAL VOLUNTEER GROUP

Charity Number: 1094153
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/10/2011 30/10/2012 30/10/2013 30/10/2014 30/10/2015
Total gross income £18.13k £18.13k £0 £8.98k £6.45k
Total expenditure £2.19k £15.00k £0 £0 £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A