KOMSO CHILDRENS HOSPITAL VOLUNTEER GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of general household building skills for the improvement & upgrade of orphanage & hospital facilities, specifically for the benefit of child inmates & patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Russia
Governance
- 11 October 2002: Standard registration
- 01 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2011 | 30/10/2012 | 30/10/2013 | 30/10/2014 | 30/10/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.13k | £18.13k | £0 | £8.98k | £6.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £15.00k | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2015 | 31 October 2016 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2014 | 13 October 2015 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 5 AUGUST 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") IN ST. PETERSBURG RUSSIA, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE ARE OF BENEFIT") TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 21 PARTICULARLY BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, IN THE ST. PETERSBURG REGIONAL HOSPITAL BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND SUPPORT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window