FLASH MUSICALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Flash Musicals was originally set up with the view to offering young people from low income and disadvantaged backgrounds the chance to become involved in the performing arts. The Charity is particularly keen to work with young and older people who are disabled and/or have special needs. The Charity will encourage and promote healthy lifestyle choices incorporating our community fruit/veg project.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £36,797 from 5 government contract(s) and £115,737 from 10 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
- Brent
- Harrow
Governance
- 16 October 2002: Standard registration
- 04 March 2025: Funds received from 276388 FINCHLEY AND FRIERN BARNET OPERATIC SOCIETY
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCIS CAROL ANN O'DONAGHUE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Cranmer | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JEFFREY SYMMONDS | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHARON LYDIA MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN MARIA FULCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.50k | £110.36k | £99.24k | £100.00k | £184.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.99k | £79.40k | £96.09k | £116.25k | £130.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £36.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.99k | N/A | £76.85k | £63.12k | £115.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 29TH JULY 2001 AND AS AMENDED ON 22ND SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 14TH APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF THE VISUAL, MUSICAL AND DRAMATIC ARTS IN AND AROUND THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 WENLOCK ROAD
EDGWARE
HA8 9JG
- Phone:
- 02089529134
- Email:
- flashmusicals@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window