Financial history URSULINE PREPARATORY SCHOOL PFA

Charity Number: 1092472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £56.08k £10.48k £6.77k £58.27k £48.85k
Total expenditure £52.34k £12.29k £5.13k £48.98k £39.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A