THE SHREWSBURY AND DISTRICT BREATHING CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons in Shrewsbury and District who suffer from Chronic Respiratory Disease, offering a. Advice, information and support b. Provision of recreational and leisure activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Shropshire
Governance
- 11 July 2003: Standard registration
- 13 February 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 13 February 2024: Funds transferred to 512394 SEVERN HOSPICE LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.73k | £25.76k | £29.61k | £32.33k | £32.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.47k | £29.35k | £31.14k | £28.19k | £26.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED 23 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN SHREWSBURY AND DISTRICT WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM CHRONIC LUNG DISEASE PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF: A) ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT BY SAID PERSONS AND THEIR CARERS. B) BY PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
SHREWSBURY AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window