FRIENDS OF THE NIGEL HUNTER NURSERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the work of Nigel Hunter Nursery, and other similar centres in GLoucestershire, offering developmental care and therapy for 0 to 3 year old children with special needs. It makes grants towards equipment, improvement of facilities, additional therapists and support for individual families and transport costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 October 2002: Standard registration
- 10 July 2013: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 10 July 2013: Funds transferred to 1011611 THE PIED PIPER TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.07k | £14.68k | £24.30k | £12.04k | £18.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.30k | £18.67k | £9.43k | £11.28k | £24.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 15 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 26 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 30 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 29 AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABILITY OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE NIGEL HUNTER NURSERY, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE NURSERY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NIGEL HUNTER NURSERY GLOUCESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window