Financial history CFC FAMILY MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1099118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £207.04k £54.76k £139.95k £169.24k £184.09k
Total expenditure £255.84k £34.26k £116.67k £177.61k £159.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A