CFC FAMILY MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evangelize families of their faith under the power of the Holy Spirit. We have the renewal of Couples (Married & Living-In), Singles, Youth and Kids. They undergo a series of talks and eventually, commit themselves to a new life with Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Throughout England
- Isle Of Man
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 August 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caezar Buco | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jose Emmanuel Enage | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerwin Premarion | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rionel Cruz | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jose Emmanuel Rama | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.04k | £54.76k | £139.95k | £169.24k | £184.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £255.84k | £34.26k | £116.67k | £177.61k | £159.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 May 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 May 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 October 2022 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 October 2022 | 204 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 JUNE 2003. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 9 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN RELATION TO MARITAL AND FAMILY MATTERS, THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spaces
12 Hammersmith Grove
LONDON
W6 7AP
- Phone:
- 07584414290
- Website:
-
couplesforchristuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window