BRITISH AUTOGENIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and Education Information and Promotion Research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 2002: Standard registration
- BAS (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alison Jeanne Stewart | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tracey Jane Akins | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Linda Baines | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Donna Flack | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Fitton Bird | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Straiton | Trustee | 29 March 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.35k | £17.16k | £10.67k | £8.35k | £8.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.34k | £13.15k | £9.85k | £3.06k | £4.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST NOVEMBER 2001 AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 3 FEBRUARY 2007 as amended on 24 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE PRACTITIONERS IN THE PHILOSOPHY, THEORY AND PRACTICE OF AUTOGENIC TRAINING AND THERAPY, AND GENERALLY TO MAINTAIN THE HIGHEST STANDARDS AMONGST ACCREDITED PRACTITIONERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
36-38 Cornhill
London
EC3V 3NG
- Phone:
- 07795113656
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window