MERSEYSIDE REFUGEE SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bringing together all refugee & asylum support agencies across Merseyside to network, share information, raise issues, campaign, and provide signposting. We also provide welfare/housing advocacy case work, we offer health and well being support and employment and training advice for individual refugees and asylum seekers to help with integration and settlement for life in UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £84,662 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 18 July 2002: Standard registration
- MRSN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Buaye | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Newall | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHELAH SEMOFF | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CARMEL DERSCH | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|||||
MO TAHER | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr HARRIET GRAY | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
EWAN ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JAN LUFF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.60k | £63.96k | £75.89k | £89.44k | £110.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.42k | £52.02k | £57.71k | £55.84k | £76.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.94k | £22.71k | £44.88k | £42.02k | £84.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 FEBRUARY 2002. as amended on 24 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
The relief of persons who are refugees or asylum seekers in Merseyside by providing practical support and advocacy and bringing together different groups concerned with their welfare to network, share information and improve awareness of the issues impacting on refugees and people seeking asylum.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST ANNE'S CENTRE
7 OVERBURY STREET
LIVERPOOL
L7 3HJ
- Phone:
- 01517097557
- Email:
- info@mrsnliverpool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window