MANCHESTER CARERS FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manchester Carers Forum acts as a voice of carers in raising awareness of the challenges which face carers. We support carers through peer support networks and by bringing carers together to reduce isolation. We work at a strategic partnership level with carers support networks, local government and healthcare commissioning to ensure carers get the best support possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £195,359 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
Governance
- 30 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GAYNOR ELIZABETH MORGAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ann Eva Sarge | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Williamson | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Steven Alexander Bonham-Grant | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Tindall | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Laughlin | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LAKE | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Denise Jackson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.08k | £239.46k | £296.15k | £263.62k | £246.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.73k | £210.81k | £312.49k | £329.93k | £241.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £138.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.00k | £196.48k | £276.86k | £225.66k | £195.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 2004 as amended on 22 Jan 2019 as amended on 22 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
To relieve those who are sick elderly, disabled, handicapped or otherwise infirm by the provision of advice and support to Carers in Greater Manchester. To advance the education of the public by raising awareness in all matters relating to the care of those who are sick, elderly, disabled, handicapped or otherwise infirm and their Carers. To do all such other charitable things in the pursuit of the objects stated above.
Area of benefit
IN THE CITY OF MANCHESTER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR, SWAN BUILDINGS
20 SWAN STREET
Manchester
M4 5JW
- Phone:
- 07415 436382
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window