Accounts and annual returns THE MERSEYSIDE TRAMWAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 1092127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 06 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 23 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 12 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window