THE WHALLEY WITH MITTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meetings with educational speakers and craft demonstrations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 13 June 2002: Standard registration
- 15 April 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- THE MITTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.35k | £4.73k | £4.05k | £3.98k | £4.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.17k | £5.57k | £4.04k | £3.93k | £4.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 02 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 14 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 17 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 11 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 08 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ALREADY LODGED
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF COUNTRYWOMEN IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS, ALSO TO SECURE INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CLITHEROE AND WHALLEY IN THE COUNTY OF LANCASHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window