B: RAP LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
brap is an equality and human rights based advisory organisation. We are based in Birmingham and work locally, regionally and nationally. We were established in 1999 to provide a progressive and evidence-based approach to mitigating inequality and discrimination. Our mission is to help people, communities and the organisations that serve them to turn equality into reality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,127,089
Donations and legacies | £6.50k | |
Charitable activities | £1.12m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£921,850
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £921.85k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £80,736 from 3 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £921.85k | |
Retained for future use | £205.24k |
People

9 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 September 2006: Standard registration
- THE BIRMINGHAM RACE ACTION PARTNERSHIP LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annabelle Mary Burns | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Eaves-Seeley | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Harris | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Paul Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NALEDI KLINE | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Simon Williams | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Melinda Connelly | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
INDERJIT DEHAL | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £643.16k | £872.70k | £726.36k | £642.34k | £1.13m | |
|
Total expenditure | £502.03k | £549.20k | £654.83k | £731.86k | £921.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £42.34k | N/A | £24.00k | £3.40k | £80.74k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £589 | £1.43k | £4.91k | £6.50k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £643.16k | £872.11k | £724.93k | £637.43k | £1.12m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £502.03k | £549.20k | £654.83k | £731.86k | £921.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.06k | £9.18k | £15.66k | £20.87k | £26.47k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £400.08k | £722.20k | £1.03m | £966.33k | £1.01m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £61.15k | £63.88k | £304.76k | £337.70k | £186.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/01/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/08/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28/02/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY TO: ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION AND ENCOURAGE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY; PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND EQUAL RIGHTS FOR A RANGE OF EXCLUDED GROUPS (IN RELATION TO RACE, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, RELIGION OR BELIEF AND GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT); PROMOTE ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO EQUALITY AND HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES AND PUBLISH THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; CULTIVATE A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND HUMAN RIGHTS. BRAP WILL ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITIES ONLY WHEN THE ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED. THESE ACTIVITIES WILL NOT DOMINATE THE OTHER ACTIVITIES THAT THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT IN ORDER TO DIRECTLY FURTHER ITS OBJECTS AND AIMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brap
Unit F1
The Tubeworks
48-52 Floodgate Street
BIRMINGHAM
B5 5SL
- Phone:
- 01212957309
- Email:
- brap@brap.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window