Financial history F A C NETWORK

Charity number: 1093726
Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £24.98k £25.00k £24.97k £24.90k £24.10k
Total expenditure £22.30k £22.79k £23.78k £22.90k £22.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A