F A C NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a community resource center where community members can get the support they need to solve their problems through information, advice, personal support, signposting and referrals to help them reach mainstream services. We provide elderly people with practical assistance to enable them to get the necessary goods and services in order to maintain their independence
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 September 2002: Standard registration
- FRANCOPHONE COMMUNITY (Working name)
- FRANCOPHONE AFRICAN COMMUNITY NETWORK (Previous name)
- FRANCOPHONE AFRICAN COMMUNITY OF THE WEST MIDLANDS (Previous name)
- FRANCOPHONE AFRICAN COMMUNITY OF WEST MIDLANDS AND SOUTH YORKSHIRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Armand Pilo | Trustee | 06 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alice Menga | Trustee | 02 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
GERVAIS LOUHANANA | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.98k | £25.00k | £24.97k | £24.90k | £24.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.30k | £22.79k | £23.78k | £22.90k | £22.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/02/2002 AS AMENDED ON 30/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2013 as amended on 19 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THE FRANCOPHONE AFRICAN COMMUNITY AND REFUGEES AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF SAID BENEFICIARIES BY ANY LAWFUL CHARITABLE MEANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Homewell Walk
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 8HA
- Phone:
- 01158084558
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window