Governing document F A C NETWORK
Charity Number: 1093726

Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/02/2002 AS AMENDED ON 30/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2013 as amended on 19 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THE FRANCOPHONE AFRICAN COMMUNITY AND REFUGEES AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF SAID BENEFICIARIES BY ANY LAWFUL CHARITABLE MEANS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.