MIRACLES TO BELIEVE IN (A CHARITY FOR CHILDREN WITH AUTISM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Miracles to Believe In will consider requests for full or part funding of projects or specific initiatives or needs which will assist children with Autism in Leicester and Leicestershire. It aims to complement the activities of other statutory bodies and charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 12 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIANNE JOAN MARTIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Hilary Jane Cooper | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES PETER HOLDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JULIAN HEUBECK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.66k | £5.26k | £6.87k | £192.04k | £11.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.83k | £1.59k | £6.33k | £13.18k | £40.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 27 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 2 OCTOBER 2003 &7 JANUARY 2004. as amended on 30 May 2022
Charitable objects
For the relief of children with autism and the advancement of their education in the Leicestershire area by the provision of equipment, facilities and excursions. Participation in excursions is extended to include people with autism up to and including 35 years of age.
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 GREY CRESCENT
NEWTOWN LINFORD
LEICESTER
LE6 0AA
- Phone:
- 01530244790
- Email:
- heubecks@googlemail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window