MOUNTSORREL WAR MEMORIALS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes. Sports/recreation, provides buildings/facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 11 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penalope Maguire | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Scott Green | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Michael Broughton | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Harper-Davies | Trustee | 02 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Bruce | Trustee | 12 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Doyle | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Claudian John Walpole | Trustee | 29 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN EDWARD RIDDLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM LEMON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM DARRICOURT ANTILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN RICHARD BAINES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Paul Albert Harris | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12 | £15 | £62 | £77 | £236 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £17.96k | £0 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 18 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF A COMPREHENSIVE SET OF SPORTING, RECREATIONAL AND COMMUNITY FACILITIES BASED IN THE VILLAGE OF MOUNTSORREL IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE FOR THE USE OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN PARTICULAR THE RESIDENTS OF THE VILLAGES OF MOUNTSORREL, ROTHLEY, COSSINGTON, QUORN, BARROW UPON SOAR AND SILEBY IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE AND TO HOLD AND DEVELOP LAND IN THE OWNERSHIP OF THE COMPANY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC FOR RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958.
Area of benefit
MOUNTSORREL, ROTHLEY, COSSINGTON, QUORN, BARROW UPON SOAR AND SILEBY IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Main Street
Hoby
MELTON MOWBRAY
LE14 3DT
- Phone:
- 01664434487
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window