ENDLESHAM HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Endlesham Hall provides a safe and affordable space for community activities, welcoming people from all walks of life to connect and enjoy shared experiences, build new skills, find a sense of belonging and thrive together. In particular, the hall supports local groups, individuals and projects with a focus on education and wellbeing, the creative arts, faith, spirituality and nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 20 October 2022: Standard registration
- ENDLESHAM HALL (Working name)
- BALHAM COMMUNITY CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Potter | Trustee | 19 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Figueiredo | Trustee | 19 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Mastrogiovanni | Trustee | 19 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.75k | £87.72k | £186.07k | £130.74k | £76.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.30k | £101.27k | £89.55k | £218.67k | £111.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £104.46k | £59.06k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 01 MAY 2003 as amended on 16 Sep 2021 as amended on 08 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 To advance a Christ centred faith 3.2 To relieve poverty, hardship, sickness and distress among all peoples of the world 3.3 To advance education and training 3.4 To further such other charitable purposes and such other charities as the Trustees shall decide
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE (IN PARTICULAR IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH, LAMBETH AND CROYDON).
Linked charities
- 20 October 2022 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
ENDLESHAM HALL
48 ENDLESHAM ROAD
BALHAM
LONDON
SW12 8JL
- Phone:
- 02086733939
- Email:
- office@endleshamhall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window