WASHINGTON ASYLUM SEEKERS PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the past year we have provided help and advice to asylum seekers and refugees, we have also run a clothing and furniture store but at present we are in the process of winding up our activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 14 August 2002: Standard registration
- 04 December 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 04 December 2009: Funds transferred to 1044674 WASHINGTON CHURCH OF CHRIST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2004 | 01/09/2005 | 01/09/2006 | 01/09/2007 | 01/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.54k | £105.42k | £79.53k | £75.98k | £42.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.12k | £85.39k | £103.45k | £78.06k | £50.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2008 | 09 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2008 | 09 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 September 2007 | 01 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2007 | 22 February 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 September 2006 | 30 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2006 | 21 February 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 September 2005 | 29 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2005 | 31 May 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 September 2004 | 10 June 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2004 | 10 June 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 26 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED ON 23 JULY 2002 AND 8 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
2.1 TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN THE TYNE AND WEAR AREA, WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. 2.2 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. 2.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT OF LOCAL PEOPLE AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THEIR INCLUSION INTO THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
TYNE AND WEAR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window