BYWORTH TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works primarily but not exclusively in the UK and Africa to advance education, relieve poverty and to provide or assist in the provision of recreational facilities for children and young people with the object of improving their conditions of life. Occasional donations are also made to other charities. It does not give grants to students seeking funding for study abroad or gap years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Liberia
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Syria
Governance
- 16 June 2003: Standard registration
- SHOES FOR AFRICA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID TREACHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Patricia Jane Treacher | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £379 | £5 | £2.01k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.75k | £3.05k | £1.34k | £2.00k | £1.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 January 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE PRIMARILY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOFTS HOUSE
BYWORTH
PETWORTH
GU28 0HW
- Phone:
- 01798342987
- Email:
- dtreacher2@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window