REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD KING OF KINGS TABERNACLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is the advancement and propagation of the Christian religion and the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 09 May 2002: Standard registration
- RCCG KING OF KINGS TABERNACLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUWASEYI FASOGBON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adeola Ogundipe | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADEBOWALE ODEBODE | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
AKIN OBEMBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TAYO AKINNUOYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.12k | £193.04k | £227.28k | £251.15k | £224.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.32k | £204.65k | £203.30k | £207.00k | £245.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 21ST MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 HALBUTT STREET
DAGENHAM
RM9 5AS
- Phone:
- 02085179552
- Email:
- ca@kktrccg.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window