AFRICAN AND AFRO CARIBBEAN SUPPORT NETWORK FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
African and Afro Caribbean Support Network is a charity that supports people with learning disabilites and their carers who are from black and minority ethnic (BME) communities within the borough of Waltham Forest. These supports are in areas of advocacy, respite breaks, gardening, money matters and community involvement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 12 February 2004: Standard registration
- 20 June 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- AACSN (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.51k | £47.51k | £49.53k | £16.38k | £19.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.86k | £54.86k | £40.35k | £28.46k | £36.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 07 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 07 June 2013 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 28 May 2012 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 05 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 20 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 15 December 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 04 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
3.1 TO RELIEVE BLACK AFRICAN AND AFRO CARIBBEAN PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES ("USERS") AND THEIR CARERS ("CARERS") AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING,) BY PROVIDING: 3.1.1 DEVELOPING AND FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF A RANGE OF SERVICES TO MEET THEIR NEEDS; 3.1.2 TARGETED SUPPORT SERVICES, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR CARERS; 3.1.3 ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND BY OFFERING INFORMATION THROUGH NETWORKING ON SOCIAL AND WELFARE BENEFITS; AND 3.1.4 ADVOCACY SERVICES ON BEHALF OF USERS AND CARERS; 3.2 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN GENERAL AND TO RAISE AWARENESS AND BETTER UNDERSTANDING ABOUT LEARNING DISABILITIES (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE BLACK AFRICAN AND AFRO CARIBBEAN COMMUNITIES); AND 3.3 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BLACK AFRICAN AND AFRO CARIBBEAN COMMUNITIES AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window