Accounts and annual returns TIGERS SPORT AND EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1092287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 11 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 July 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 July 2022 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window