Financial history THE OCTOPUS PROJECT LIMITED

Charity Number: 1101553
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £72.87k £91.57k £91.57k £46.22k £31.81k
Total expenditure £76.91k £85.81k £85.81k £68.17k £59.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A