Governing document THE BEACON SCHOOL PARENTS SOCIETY
Charity number: 1098878

Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED 4 JULY 2003 AND 3 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2021 AS AMENDED ON 09 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE BEACON SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FUNDS,ITEMS,SERVICES AND FACILITIES THAT IT IS NOT THE OBLIGATION OF ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY TO PROVIDE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.