YOUTH WITH A FUTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Y.W.A.F. works alongside other organisations, to support young homeless people aged 16-25, and those in supported housing. We also support many local positive youth initiatives and individuals with education, training and employment needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 05 November 2002: Standard registration
- YWAF (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Christine Ralls | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Janeanne Mullane | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ralls | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Skinner | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Copestake | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEITH WETHERILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE CRISFIELD | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR NICK MAY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.46k | £3.77k | £8.59k | £15.19k | £6.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.30k | £10.51k | £6.16k | £5.10k | £15.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
I) FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE MENDIP AREA, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE PRESERVATION AN PROTECTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, BASIC PROVISIONS AND OTHER MATERIAL NEEDS AND BY RAISING LOCAL AWARENESS OF THEIR PROBLEMS.
Area of benefit
MENDIP AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o St. Peter & St. Paul's Church
Parish Office
Peter Street
SHEPTON MALLET
Somerset
BA4 5BL
- Phone:
- 01749346123
- Email:
- ywaf@ywaf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window