DISABILITY CHALLENGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Challengers provides play & leisure opportunities for disabled children and young people between the ages of 2 & 18 years old. Our schemes give children & young people a space of their own to have fun, meet friends and challenge their impairments through play.Challengers operate a non-exclusion policy which means that any child can attend Challengers regardless of the severity of their impairment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,879,502
Donations and legacies | £787.75k | |
Charitable activities | £1.84m | |
Other trading activities | £247.28k | |
Investments | £8.25k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,829,219
Raising funds | £311.34k | |
Charitable activities | £2.52m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £704,060 from 4 government contract(s) and £238,269 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £311.34k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.52m | |
Retained for future use | £50.28k |
People

10 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 December 2002: Standard registration
- CHALLENGERS (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danae Salwan | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Bennett | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell Stuart Harvey | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jake Hatt | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Stenlake | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Morris | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bernard McAlister | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Megan Dooley | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Sanders | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Smith | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.25m | £2.91m | £2.86m | £2.65m | £2.88m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.57m | £2.82m | £2.92m | £2.61m | £2.83m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £833.07k | £623.66k | £846.26k | £730.50k | £704.06k | |
|
Income from government grants | £582.90k | £553.79k | £362.05k | £203.57k | £238.27k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £835.45k | £1.15m | £768.81k | £941.50k | £787.75k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £265.43k | £124.63k | £235.35k | £188.68k | £247.28k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.15m | £1.64m | £1.85m | £1.51m | £1.84m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.37k | £2.00k | £1.01k | £2.32k | £8.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £70.42k | £3.00k | £99.87k | £30.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.16m | £2.55m | £2.64m | £2.34m | £2.52m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £412.86k | £276.54k | £274.69k | £266.06k | £311.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £54.74k | £55.77k | £70.30k | £69.57k | £63.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.18m | £3.08m | £3.03m | £3.19m | £3.26m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.09m | £1.32m | £1.32m | £1.38m | £1.34m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £427.58k | £464.99k | £480.21k | £666.48k | £648.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2001. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAY 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JUL 2018 as amended on 04 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND THROUGH RECREATION, ARTISTIC, SPORTING AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER FOR THE LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS INCLUDING THOSE CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH A PHYSICAL AND/OR LEARNING DISABILITY, BEING FACILITIES OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS MAY HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND THEIR DISABILITIES, BY 1. PROVIDING TRULY INCLUSIVE, FUN AND SAFE PLACES WHERE ALL DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED UP TO 25 YEARS CAN SPEND TIME WITH THEIR FRIENDS 2. PROVIDING A POSITIVE IMPACT FOR FAMILIES AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY ALONGSIDE SERVICE DELIVERY ACROSS SOUTH EAST ENGLAND 3. TO NEVER EXCLUDE A CHILD OR YOUNG PERSON AND ENSURING SERVICES ARE DESIGNED TO MEET THE NEEDS AND DESIRES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE 4. DELIVERING HIGH QUALITY TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT AND VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES THAT ARE DEVELOPED TO ENHANCE THE WELLBEING OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE 5. LEADING BY EXAMPLE AND BE A CHAMPION FOR INCLUSION THROUGH THE OFFER OF PARTICIPATION, TRAINING, INFORMATION AND GUIDANCE SO THAT OTHERS CAN DO THE SAME 6. PROVIDING OTHER SERVICES THAT ENABLE THE CHARITY TO DELIVER SUPPORT TO YOUNG PEOPLE AND CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS ACHIEVING THE VISION OF A WORLD WHERE ALL DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE CAN PLAY TOGETHER FREELY.
Area of benefit
GUILDFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Challengers Playcentre
Stoke Park
London Road
GUILDFORD
GU1 1TU
- Phone:
- 01483579390
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window