THE LATCHMERE INFANT SCHOOL LEARNING FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE ADDITTIONAL FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR RESOURSES FOR LATCHMERE SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 23 July 2002: Standard registration
- THE LEARNING FUND (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Coles | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNALISA STEELS | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.50k | £14.58k | £9.64k | £8.61k | £6.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £28.09k | £14.01k | £9.31k | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 April 2025 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 19TH JUNE 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE OBJECT OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN ATTENDING THE LATCHMERE INFANT SCHOOL (OR SUCH SUCCESSOR SCHOOL AS IT MAY BECOME) BY PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES IN ADDITION TO THOSE PROVIDED BY PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
SURREY - KINGSTON ON THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 Durlston Road
Kingston upon Thames
KT2 5RU
- Phone:
- 07882903156
- Email:
- stevehole33@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window