THE PILGRIMS WAY RIVER WAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage The Phoenix Centre as a community centre for the benefit of the inhabitants of St Mary's Ward, Andover, Hampshire. To advance education, provide faclilities in the interests of social welfare and for recreation and leisure, with the object of improving the living conditions of the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 02 July 2002: Standard registration
- PILGRIMS RIVER WAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION TA THE PHOENIX CENTRE (Working name)
- THE PHOENIX CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina McGarry | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alexei Roberts | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael McGarry | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.75k | £20.34k | £3.71k | £13.70k | £15.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.59k | £10.76k | £12.99k | £12.87k | £14.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2025 | 385 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 February 2025 | 743 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
A) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AT PILGRIM'S WAY/ RIVER WAY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE WAY OUT CLUB") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. B) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PILGRIM'S WAY / RIVER WAY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY ST MARY'S WARD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL; RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID INHABITANTS; C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
INHABITANTS OF PILGRIM'S WAY / RIVER WAY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY ST MARY'S WARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Phoenix Centre
Pilgrims Way
ANDOVER
Hampshire
SP10 5HW
- Phone:
- 01264400737
- Email:
- phoenix.centre@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window