REHMAT FOUNDATION CHARITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Please visit the website for current projects. The Charity's main objective is to provide free proactive & reactive medical care to the poor in, and surrounding Jhelum in Pakistan. Including regular Mobile clinics and camps for hepatitis,dental and eye problems. Water Pump installations and disaster recovery as and when required. Its latest project is the opening of a Kidney Care Centre in Jhelum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
- Pakistan
Governance
- 23 July 2002: Standard registration
- REHMAT MEDICAL AID (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr AHSAN MIRZA | Chair | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Imran Mirza | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Majib Rashid | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.91k | £97.15k | £128.45k | £48.69k | £52.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.49k | £36.35k | £106.50k | £50.91k | £48.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 September 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 September 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE ON 24 MARCH, 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE MEDICAL ADVICE, CARE AND ASSISTANCE TO THE POOR AND NEEDY COMMUNITY OF JHELUM, PAKISTAN.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
124 CITY ROAD
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 02088971284
- Email:
- Info@rehmatmedicalaid.com
- Website:
-
rehmatmedicalaid.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window