RUNNYMEDE SPECIAL NEEDS JUNIOR YOUTH CLUB (BRIGHT LIGHTS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include use of the soft play area, crafts and external outings, trips have included an Isle of Wight weekend, Euro Disney, Spain, Lapland UK, Paultons park, Beale park, Legoland. We hold a Christmas party every year where the children receive a visit and presents from father christmas. Easter eggs are also received.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,842 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 October 2002: Standard registration
- BRIGHT LIGHTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy O'Neill | Chair | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN DUFFY | Trustee | 07 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.07k | £7.33k | £16.28k | £15.04k | £14.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.24k | £4.50k | £12.17k | £15.38k | £13.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.23k | N/A | N/A | £12.84k | £12.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 March 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 19TH SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS IN RUNNYMEDE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
RUNNYMEDE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 QUEENSWAY
SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
TW16 6HA
- Phone:
- 01932783864
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window