FORESIGHT NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation mission statement is "to provide the way forward for the disabled community of North East Lincolnshire and surrounding areas. Empowering individuals to a new beginning, a brighter future, and a full and enjoyable life.?
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£1,475,014
Donations and legacies | £525.01k | |
Charitable activities | £524.03k | |
Other trading activities | £63.56k | |
Investments | £90.90k | |
Other | £271.52k |
Total expenditure:
£1,186,405
Raising funds | £109.18k | |
Charitable activities | £1.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £65,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £181,556 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £109.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.08m | |
Retained for future use | £288.61k |
People

26 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 19 December 2002: Standard registration
- FORESIGHT PROJECT (NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE) LTD (Previous name)
- FORESIGHT PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Arthur Fuller | Chair | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Carolyn Doyley | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jade Laverick | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Hanson | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Louis Mellor | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David Mitchell | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Josie Moon | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Fuller | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Smith | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jackie Mitchell | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel Newman | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Phil Hanley | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Scott | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs Patricia Taylor | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
ronald shepherd cllr | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
WILLIAM JOHN MAYNELL KING | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY NEWTON JEWITT | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10m | £1.00m | £1.48m | £1.00m | £1.48m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23m | £979.67k | £889.13k | £1.15m | £1.19m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £65.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £65.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.29k | £197.51k | £89.12k | £181.56k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £413.65k | £96.61k | £494.81k | £279.29k | £525.01k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £105.51k | £53.52k | £43.17k | £48.50k | £63.56k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £564.27k | £470.54k | £729.37k | £515.46k | £524.03k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £16.58k | £120.49k | £95.90k | £146.38k | £90.90k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £261.64k | £113.53k | £14.58k | £271.52k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £576.04k | £807.43k | £820.65k | £1.06m | £1.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £187.55k | £170.24k | £68.48k | £86.68k | £109.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.34k | £15.38k | £14.35k | £18.57k | £16.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £470.97k | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.36m | £4.67m | £4.59m | £4.15m | £2.75m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £825.00k | £590.00k | £1.60m | |
|
Other assets | £1.13m | £1.33m | £1.87m | £815.66k | £861.45k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.14m | £2.53m | £3.19m | £2.67m | £2.71m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 August 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 August 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/08/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 JAN 2018 as amended on 13 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT BLIND AND VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE, OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED, PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE “AREA OF BENEFIT”) BY: (A) ESTABLISHING RELATIONSHIPS OF TRUST BETWEEN CARE AGENCIES AND SERVICE PROVIDERS FOR THE BENEFIT OF OUR BENEFICIARIES. (B) COMMUNICATING AND CO-OPERATING IN DEVELOPING AND PROVIDING SERVICES FOR OUR BENEFICIARIES. (C) WORKING TOWARDS ESTABLISHING THE NEEDS OF OUR BENEFICIARIES, HIGHLIGHTING GAPS IN CURRENT SERVICES AND AVOIDING DUPLICATION. (D) ACTING AS A PROVIDER OF INFORMATION OF SERVICES TO OUR BENEFICIARIES. I) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (D) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; (E) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (F) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (G) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES; OR (H) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 NEWMARKET STREET
GRIMSBY
SOUTH HUMBERSIDE
DN32 7SF
- Phone:
- 01472269666
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window