Financial history BALDOCK MUSEUM AND LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1092535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £966 £486 £617 £1.24k £1.68k
Total expenditure £634 £348 £1.05k £542 £1.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A