Accounts and annual returns HARTLIP PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1092046
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 21 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 21 March 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 12 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 12 January 2015 On Time