FRIENDS IN ASSOCIATION WITH BLACKPOOL SCHOOL (FABS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Engaging in fundraising activities including the annual summer fayre, bonfire night, sponsored walks and run, tuck shops, leavers and christmas parties, school discos plus any other fundraising activity the committee decide to run.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 05 July 2002: Standard registration
- BLACKPOOL CE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liz Ruffles | Chair | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Watts | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Bowser | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Hollis | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carly Balsdon | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Knibb | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hubert Bowser | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirstin Thirtle | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Head | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Limb | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.60k | £9.55k | £16.11k | £16.93k | £19.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.89k | £7.34k | £18.90k | £16.57k | £18.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2021 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 17 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ILSINGTON IN DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blackpool Primary School
Liverton
Newton Abbot
TQ12 6JB
- Phone:
- 07790038567
- Email:
- blackpoolfriends@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window