LOVE RUSSIA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Works in the west of Russia in Moscow, Ryazan, St Petersburg and Volkhov regions. Supports orphaned and needy children, orphanage leavers, single destitute mothers, disabled young people, a day care centre for the disabled, and a few elderly destitue people. Staff visit Russia every two months to monitor projects and project funding, and progress of individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Russia
Governance
- 22 May 2002: Standard registration
- LOVE RUSSIA (Working name)
- LRCharity (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Ball | Chair | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Sara Mair | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Doubleday | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bradley | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Thomas Frederick Lindsell | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Wisbey | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Worland | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £314.17k | £326.91k | £278.91k | £400.41k | £350.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £243.61k | £260.66k | £321.86k | £319.12k | £332.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 JUNE 2001 AND 29 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE TERRITORIES OF THE REPUBLICS OF THE FORMER SOVIET UNION AND OTHER COUNTRIES, ESPECIALLY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. THEREBY DEMONSTRATING PRACTICAL CHRISTIAN COMPASSION AND WHERE APPROPRIATE SHARING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
FORMER SOVIET UNION AND OTHER COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Farm
Church Lane
Thrumpton
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 0AX
- Phone:
- 01159831100
- Email:
- postmaster@loverussia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window