Accounts and annual returns JEREMY COLLER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1093740
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 03 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 28 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 28 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2015 11 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 19 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 19 December 2014 On Time