RANFURLY CHARITABLE SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes Literacy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
- Australia
- The Bahamas
Governance
- 06 July 2004: Standard registration
- 30 August 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2012 | 01/04/2013 | 01/04/2014 | 01/04/2015 | 01/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.29k | £1.92k | £1.37k | £1.06k | £447 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.35k | £0 | £1.63k | £410 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2016 | 09 April 2017 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED 4 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE DONATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF BOOKS AND LITERATURE PROMOTING LITERACY. TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE RANFURLY HOME FOR CHILDREN, NASSAU, BAHAMAS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window