Accounts and annual returns MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL AID TO KENYA

Charity number: 1093115
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 November 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 November 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 April 2024 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 April 2024 161 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 December 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 December 2022 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2022 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 March 2022 148 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 March 2021 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 March 2021 129 days late Download Open in new window