Financial history MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL AID TO KENYA

Charity number: 1093115
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £144.62k £119.03k £174.04k £166.71k £111.25k
Total expenditure £234.36k £123.06k £150.38k £110.94k £142.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A