THE UK CONFERENCE OF POSTGRADUATE EDUCATION ADVISORS IN GENERAL PRACTICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The two leading educational bodies in GP education UKCEA/APCE have cemented their thinking with a single shared website/joint newsletter.The UKCEA bursary and trainer award schemes continue; new development is the trainee award. DOOHLs meetings commenced; the Spring/residential meetings proved successful. UKCEA will continue to seek engagement with the biggest group of GP Educators.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 October 2002: Standard registration
- 26 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- UKCEA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.50k | £54.34k | £13.05k | £8.26k | £6 | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.59k | £68.72k | £21.94k | £9.71k | £4.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 15 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 01 February 2017 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 16 APRIL, 2002 AND AMENDED ON 14 AUGUST, 2002.
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING RELATING TO MEDICAL GENERAL PRACTICE; AND 2.TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND RELIEVE ILLNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF PROFESSIONAL SKILLS AND EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT FOR PEOPLE WORKING IN THE FIELD OF POSTGRADUATE EDUCATION FOR MEDICAL GENERAL PRACTICE, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION FOR DIRECTORS AND SENIOR EDUCATIONAL ADVISORS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window