Financial history THE ETERNAL SACRED ORDER OF CHERUBIM AND SERAPHIM CHURCH NOAH'S ARK

Charity Number: 1097500
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.73k £6.45k £12.18k £15.07k £13.14k
Total expenditure £13.41k £8.15k £14.24k £11.37k £11.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A